Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Canali

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1764BornPerugia
23 Dec 178622.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Perugia, Italy
20 Dec 178824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Perugia, Italy
26 Sep 181449.9AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
30 Nov 181450.1InstalledBishop of Spoleto, Italy
28 Aug 182055.8AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
24 Apr 182762.5ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
21 May 182762.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
30 Sep 183166.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
23 Jun 183469.6Elevated to Cardinal
1 Aug 183469.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
11 Apr 183570.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Canali
Francesco Cardinal Canali (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a cardinal for 3.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1814, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 232, and Page 351
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 369
  • i: CB, 5 Sep 2012
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1831

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jul 2016