Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Gavi

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Livorno

Titular Bishop of MeloŽ in Lycia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1775BornLivorno
21 Dec 179924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Livorno, Italy
3 Jul 184872.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Livorno, Italy
3 Jul 184872.7AppointedTitular Bishop of MeloŽ in Lycia
4 Apr 186993.4DiedApostolic Administrator of Livorno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Gavi:
Bishop Girolamo Gavi (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Livorno

  • a priest for 69.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 341, and Page 384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013