Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignatius Papasian, C.A.M. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Tharona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1764¹Born
11 May 183874.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tharona
10 Jun 183874.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tharona
22 May 185288.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Tharona

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Papasian
Archbishop Ignatius Papasian C.A.M. (born 1764, died ) Titular Archbishop of Tharona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast