Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph O’Finan, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Killala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1770¹BornKillala
1787¹17.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Feb 183565.1AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
21 Mar 183565.2Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
27 Nov 184777.9DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph O’Finan
Bishop Francis Joseph O’Finan O.P. (born 1770, died ) Bishop of Killala

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1835, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016