Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrian Jardinier

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1808BornMonthey
7 Apr 183224.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
21 Apr 183224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
19 Aug 187567.3SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
23 Sep 187567.4ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
5 Oct 187567.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
26 Feb 190192.9DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Adrian Jardinier:
Bishop Adrian Jardinier (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 508

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013