Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximilian Burmann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Diocletiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1648Born
6 Apr 168233.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
6 Apr 168233.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletiana
14 Jun 168234.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocletiana
20 Oct 168537.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Maximilian Burmann
Bishop Maximilian Burmann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonn

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 185
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 10
  • ob/ln: ATh, 6 Nov 2015
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,600

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast