Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael O’Hea

Deceased

Bishop of Ross


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1808BornWoodfield
Sep 1834³26.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 185749.3AppointedBishop of Ross, Ireland
7 Feb 185849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ross, Ireland
18 Dec 187668.3DiedBishop of Ross, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael O’Hea:
Bishop Michael O’Hea (born , died ) Bishop of Ross

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 486

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013