Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Delany

Deceased

Bishop of Cork


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1804BornBandon
8 Jan 182823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cork, Ireland
9 Jul 184742.5AppointedBishop of Cork, Ireland
15 Aug 184742.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cork, Ireland
14 Nov 188681.9DiedBishop of Cork, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Delany:
Bishop William Delany (born , died ) Bishop of Cork

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013