Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick O’Boyle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Killala

Titular Bishop of Mammilla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1887BornBallina
18 Jun 191123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Killala, Ireland
12 Dec 195063.0AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
25 Feb 195163.2Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
12 Oct 197082.9RetiredBishop of Killala, Ireland
12 Oct 197082.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mammilla
25 Nov 197184.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Killala, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick O’Boyle:
Bishop Patrick O’Boyle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Killala

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • 3m77: CB, 22 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013