Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Díaz de Lamadrid, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1729BornQuito
28 Jul 177748.0AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
1778¹48.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
3 Dec 179263.4AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
4 Jun 179464.9DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Díaz de Lamadrid
Bishop José Díaz de Lamadrid O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Quito

  • a bishop for 16.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 151, and Page 351
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016