Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Zeferino Cardinal González y Díaz Tuñón, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1831BornVilloria
28 Nov 184413.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1845²13.9Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
Jan 1854³22.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Jan 187443.0AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
4 Jun 187544.4SelectedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
21 Jun 187544.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Málaga, Spain
5 Jul 187544.4ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
24 Oct 187544.7Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Spain
15 Mar 188352.1AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
10 Nov 188453.8Elevated to Cardinal
27 Mar 188554.2AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
27 Mar 188554.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of West Indies, Antilles
15 Jan 188655.0AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
17 Mar 188756.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
28 Nov 188958.8ResignedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
29 Nov 189463.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zeferino González y Díaz Tuñón:
Cardinal Zeferino González y Díaz Tuñón O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 225, and Page 309
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 361, and Page 558
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Nov 1884

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013