Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop 聲gel Velarde y Bustamante

Deceased

Bishop of Popay嫕, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1746Born
7 Jun 178842.2SelectedBishop of Popay嫕, Colombia
15 Sep 178842.5ConfirmedBishop of Popay嫕, Colombia
1 May 178943.1Ordained BishopBishop of Popay嫕, Colombia
6 Jul 180963.3DiedBishop of Popay嫕, Colombia

MicroData Summary for 聲gel Velarde y Bustamante
Bishop 聲gel Velarde y Bustamante (born , died ) Bishop of Popay嫕

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQueveda, Spain

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 312
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espa隳l, Volume 1,700, Page 106, Number 552
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations 夗iscopales, Year 1789, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 344
  • fn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast