Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Pérez y Pérez, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1846Born
1865¹18.5ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
17 Dec 187024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
10 Mar 189649.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China
10 Mar 189649.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
12 Sep 189751.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
15 Apr 191063.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Pérez y Pérez
Bishop Luis Pérez y Pérez O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Tuda de Sayago, Diocese of Zamora, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Agustin, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila, Philippines

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 228
  • bp/bd: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast