Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Murillo Velarde

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1679³BornGranada
21 Mar 172545.2AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
1 May 172545.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
6 Nov 172848.8DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Murillo Velarde:
Bishop Andrés Murillo Velarde (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 305
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 42, Number 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015