Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Muradian

Deceased

Bishop of Cisamus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1842BornDiarbekir
28 Aug 190159.7SelectedBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey
9 Sep 190159.7ConfirmedBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey
21 Nov 190159.9Ordained BishopBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey
7 Aug 190563.6AppointedBishop of Cisamus
11 Jul 191169.5DiedBishop of Cisamus

MicroData Summary for Jean Muradian:
Bishop Jean Muradian (born , died ) Bishop of Cisamus

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 364
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013