Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ignacio Munilla Aguirre

Bishop of San Sebastián


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1961 BornZumárraga
29 Jun 198624.6Ordained PriestPriest of San Sebastián, Spain
24 Jun 200644.6AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
10 Sep 200644.8Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
21 Nov 200948.0AppointedBishop of San Sebastián, Spain
9 Jan 201048.2InstalledBishop of San Sebastián, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio Munilla Aguirre:
Bishop José Ignacio Munilla Aguirre (born ) Bishop of San Sebastián

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Sebastián.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2006
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,243
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013