Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Martinengo

Deceased

Bishop of Torcello (Turris)


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jul 1643AppointedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
19 Jul 1643Ordained BishopBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
17 Jul 1673DiedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Martinengo
Bishop Marco Antonio Martinengo (died ) Bishop of Torcello (Turris)

  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 340
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 14
  • d: CB, 11 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Aug 2016