Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cesare Cardinal Monti

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1594BornMilano
17 Apr 162732.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
1628²33.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
19 Nov 162935.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
19 Nov 162935.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
28 Jan 163035.7Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
1 Mar 163035.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
20 Dec 163238.5AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
28 Nov 163339.5Elevated to Cardinal
31 Jan 163439.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
6 Aug 163440.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
20 Nov 163440.5ResignedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
16 Aug 165056.2DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Monti (VIAF: 67272422)
Cesare Cardinal Monti (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
  • a cardinal for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1629
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 86
  • ob: CB, 14 Oct 2012
  • c2+: CB, 17 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,569
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 1
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016