Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Alfonso Pérez de Guzmán

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of West Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1594³BornSanlúcar de Barrameda, Spain
1 Dec 162531.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
1626²31.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
17 May 162733.3AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
22 Dec 167076.9RetiredPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
1676²81.9DiedPatriarch Emeritus of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Pérez de Guzmán:
Patriarch Alfonso Pérez de Guzmán (born ) Patriarch Emeritus of West Indies

  • a bishop for 50.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 209, and Page 351
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 149, Number 945
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 4 Mar 2015