Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Sotomayor, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Damascus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1547BornVigo, Spain
16 Jul 163284.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
5 Sep 163284.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
3 Sep 1648100.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Damascus

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sotomayor:
Archbishop Antonio Sotomayor O.P. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Damascus

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,407
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,896
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 172
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 157, Number 993
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015