Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filiberto Alberto Bailly, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1605BornSavoia
2 Oct 163328.5ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
163529.8Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
13 Jan 165953.8AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
9 Mar 165954.0Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
3 Apr 169186.0DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filiberto Alberto Bailly:
Bishop Filiberto Alberto Bailly B. (born , died ) Bishop of Aosta

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 31 Mar 2015