Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hieronymus Maria Mileta, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1871Born
23 Sep 189322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
14 Jan 192250.7AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
26 Feb 192250.8Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
23 Nov 194776.5DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Hieronymus Maria Mileta
Bishop Hieronymus Maria Mileta O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSibenik

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1948
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast