Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Toribio de Mier

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632²BornSanta María de Collada
9 Sep 166836.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Sep 166836.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 169361.0AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
5 Apr 169361.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
8 Dec 169866.9DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Toribio de Mier:
Bishop Toribio de Mier (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Pamplona

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 234, Number 1,454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015