Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Moon Hee Jong

Auxiliary Bishop of Suwon, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Mutia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1966 Born
21 Jan 199427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Suwon, Korea (South)
23 Jul 201548.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
23 Jul 201548.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutia
10 Sep 201549.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mutia

MicroData Summary for John Moon Hee Jong
Bishop John Moon Hee Jong (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Suwon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGyeonggi-do

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Suwon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 4 Aug 2015
  • c2+: CB, 10 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,573

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast