Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Meram

Archbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean)

Bishop of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1943 BornTelkaif
11 Jun 196723.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 198340.3AppointedArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran
30 Nov 198340.3AppointedBishop of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean), Iran
11 Mar 198440.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran

MicroData Summary for Thomas Meram:
Archbishop Thomas Meram (born ) Archbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013