Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hanna Zora

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1939Born
10 Jun 196223.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 197435.1AppointedArchbishop of Ahwaz (Chaldean), Iran
27 Oct 197435.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ahwaz (Chaldean), Iran
10 Jun 201172.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada
3 May 201475.1RetiredBishop of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada
2 Oct 201677.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada

MicroData Summary for Hanna Zora
Archbishop Hanna Zora (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mar Addai of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBatnaia, Iraq

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,397
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 3 May 2014
  • d: CB, 2 Oct 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast