Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Menna

Deceased

Bishop of Minori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹BornNapoli
19 Dec 165523.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 168351.9AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
27 Dec 168351.9Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
Aug 1691³59.5DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Menna:
Bishop Domenico Menna (born 1632, died Aug 1691) Bishop of Minori

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 270
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015