Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Emblaviti

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹BornBova
24 Sep 166123.7Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 168850.4AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
7 Jun 168850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
Apr 1722³84.2DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Emblaviti:
Bishop Giovanni Emblaviti (born 1638, died Apr 1722) Bishop of Belcastro

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 116
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 24 Apr 2015