Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Caracciolo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1640³BornNapoli
22 Sep 166323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Apr 168746.8AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
4 May 168746.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
31 Mar 168948.7DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Caracciolo:
Bishop Tommaso Caracciolo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 219
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1687, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 23 Apr 2015