Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Anton von der Asseburg zu Hinnenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1707Born
25 Jan 176355.9SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
11 Apr 176356.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 176356.2ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
26 Jun 176356.3Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
26 Dec 178275.8DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Anton von der Asseburg zu Hinnenburg
Bishop Wilhelm Anton von der Asseburg zu Hinnenburg (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHinnenburg

  • a priest for 19.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 324

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast