Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Machado y Luna

Deceased

Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1701BornCáceres, Spain
2 May 174947.9SelectedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
22 Sep 174948.3ConfirmedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
16 Aug 175049.2Ordained BishopBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
29 Jan 175250.6DiedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Manuel Machado y Luna:
Bishop Manuel Machado y Luna (born , died ) Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 68, Number 326
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 436

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015