Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Ronald Matano

Bishop of Rochester, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1946 BornProvidence, RI
17 Dec 197125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
3 Mar 200558.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
19 Apr 200558.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
9 Nov 200559.2SucceededBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
6 Nov 201367.1AppointedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
3 Jan 201467.3InstalledBishop of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Ronald Matano:
Bishop Salvatore Ronald Matano (born ) Bishop of Rochester

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rochester.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,853
  • s: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2005
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2013
  • i: CB, 6 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Nov 2013