Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Martí Alanis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1928BornMilá
17 Jun 195122.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 197042.0AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
31 Jan 197142.2Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
25 Jun 200172.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Urgell, Spain
12 May 200374.5RetiredBishop of Urgell, Spain
11 Oct 200980.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Martí Alanis:
Archbishop Juan Martí Alanis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Urgell

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013