Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maldonado y Minoja

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jul 1720AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
18 Jan 1722Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
22 Jun 1722DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maldonado y Minoja:
Bishop Antonio Maldonado y Minoja (died ) Bishop of Oviedo

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 300
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 38, Number 134
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,341
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015