Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Guiyang [Kweyang]

Archidioecesis Coeiiamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Xiao Zejiang, Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 100,000 (38,625 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Guiyang, Guizhou, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kuiceu (Kweichow)
27 March 1846ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan) Vicariate Apostolic of Kuiceu (Kweichow) (erected)
16 February 1922Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kuiceu (Kweichow) (Panhien, Pougan, Ganlan, Hinjen, Hiny, Tchenfong, Lanlong, Tsehen, and Loufou along with Matchang, Nicoutchang, Tchehiang (in Kouanlin) and Potang, Hohon, Yangkia, and Cheten (in Tseyuin))
Vicariate Apostolic of Kuamsi (Liniun, Silong, and Silin)
Prefecture Apostolic of Lanlung [Anlong] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kweyang [Guiyang] (Kweiyang)
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kuiceu (Kweichow) Vicariate Apostolic of Kweyang [Guiyang] (Kweiyang)
23 March 1932Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kweyang [Guiyang] (Kweiyang) (Houping, Wuchwan, Yehho, Lungchuan, Tehkiang, Szenan, Yinkiang, Sungtao, Shihtsien, Kiangkow, Tungjen, Szehsien, Yuping , Shengki, Shiping, Tsingki, Chenyuan, Hwangping, Taikuing, Tsingkiang, Kiungshui, Tienchu, Kingping, Yungkiang, Liping, Yungtsung, ...) Mission "Sui Iuris" of Shihtsien [Shiqian] (erected)
Archdiocese of Guiyang [Kweyang]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kweyang [Guiyang] (Kweiyang) Archdiocese of Guiyang [Kweyang]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Guiyang [Kweyang]
195024,7137,000,000.4%77773203330ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Kuiceu (Kweichow)
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 131
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Kweyang [Guiyang] (Kweiyang)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 17, Page 23, to Page 25
  • Archdiocese of Guiyang [Kweyang]
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 38, Page 301, to Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 7 Apr 2024