Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maciej Łubieński

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1572BornŁubna
1602²29.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 162149.3AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
31 Oct 162149.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
14 Apr 162654.2AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
24 Mar 163159.1AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
27 Nov 164169.8AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
28 Aug 165280.6DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maciej Łubieński:
Archbishop Maciej Łubieński (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 195, and Page 287
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 147, and Page 372
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014