Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakub Uchański

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1502Born
18 Nov 155149.9AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
20 Mar 155250.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
2 Jun 156159.4AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
31 Aug 156260.7AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
5 Apr 158179.3DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jakub Uchański:
Archbishop Jakub Uchański (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 29.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,029
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 204, and Page 336
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 164
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013