Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej Marian Kurski, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

Titular Bishop of Aenus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612¹BornPoznań
7 May 165139.3AppointedBishop of Bacău, Romania
3 Aug 165139.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bacău, Romania
21 Feb 166149.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
21 Feb 166149.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenus
27 Mar 168169.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maciej Marian Kurski:
Bishop Maciej Marian Kurski O.F.M. (born 1612, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 107, and Page 70
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,922
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015