Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Pstrokoński

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590²Born
22 Dec 1644³55.0AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
19 Mar 164555.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
17 Jun 165767.5DiedBishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Pstrokoński:
Bishop Stanisław Pstrokoński (died ) Bishop of Chełm

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,783
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 147

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014