Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kasper Działyński

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597²BornPrusse
1632²35.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 163942.0AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
19 Jun 163942.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
19 Mar 164649.2DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kasper Działyński:
Bishop Kasper Działyński (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 14.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,940
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015