Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Lipski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹BornLipiu
24 May 163647.3SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
14 Sep 163647.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Oct 163647.7ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
20 Dec 163849.9AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
13 May 164152.3DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Lipski:
Archbishop Jan Lipski (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015