Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvadore Lobo

Bishop Emeritus of Baruipur, India

Apostolic Administrator of Asansol


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1945 Born
19 Mar 197327.8Ordained PriestPriest of Calcutta, India
30 May 197732.0IncardinatedPriest of Baruipur, India
16 Oct 199752.4AppointedBishop of Baruipur, India
29 Jan 199852.7Ordained BishopBishop of Baruipur, India
4 May 202075.0RetiredBishop of Baruipur, India
4 May 202075.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Asansol, India

MicroData Summary for Salvadore Lobo
Bishop Salvadore Lobo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Baruipur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMangalore, Diocese of Mangalore
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Holy Cross School, Baruipu, Diocese of Baruipur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baruipur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,232
  • r: Bollettino, 4 May 2020
  • ab: CB, 7 May 2020
  • opd: CB, 9 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 9 May 2020

Quantcast