Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Liu Shingong (Shigong)

Deceased

Bishop of Jining [Tsining], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Wumeng)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1928Born
15 Aug 195627.9Ordained PriestPriest
1989²60.3SelectedBishop of Jining [Tsining], China
12 Oct 199567.1Ordained BishopBishop of Jining [Tsining], China
9 Jun 201788.8DiedBishop of Jining [Tsining], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Liu Shingong (Shigong)
Bishop John Liu Shingong (Shigong) (born , died ) Bishop of Jining [Tsining]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWulannao (Siziwangqi, city of Wulanchabu)

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 23 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,018, Page 1,134
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast