Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Guo Zhengji

Deceased

Bishop of [Shanba (Patriotic), China]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1914Born
26 Jul 194228.1Ordained PriestPriest
1989²74.6SelectedBishop of [Shanba (Patriotic), China]
28 Oct 199076.4Ordained BishopBishop of [Shanba (Patriotic), China]
3 May 200489.9DiedBishop of [Shanba (Patriotic), China]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Guo Zhengji
Bishop Francis Xavier Guo Zhengji (born , died ) Bishop of Shanba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDengkou county
Ordained BishopSuiyuan
Death PlaceYinchuan

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 21 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 27 Mar 2020

Quantcast