Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filip Felicjan Szumborski, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1771BornOstroh
1797¹25.2Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
10 Dec 182857.1SelectedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
29 Jan 183058.2ConfirmedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
16 Mar 183058.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
19 Jan 185179.2DiedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filip Felicjan Szumborski:
Bishop Filip Felicjan Szumborski O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Chełm

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 148
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015