Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathurin-Pie Le Ruyet, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ajmer

Titular Bishop of Alexandria Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1870BornLorient, France
4 Oct 188918.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Jul 189524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Jun 193160.5AppointedBishop of Ajmer, India
28 Oct 193160.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ajmer, India
16 Jul 193867.6ResignedBishop of Ajmer, India
16 Jul 193867.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Alexandria Minor
9 Jun 196190.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ajmer, India

MicroData Summary for Mathurin-Pie Le Ruyet:
Bishop Mathurin-Pie Le Ruyet O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ajmer

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • p/op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013