Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emiddio Lenti

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1628³BornAscoli Satriano
23 Dec 165123.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 168556.3AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
23 Apr 168556.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
10 Jan 169162.1DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emiddio Lenti:
Bishop Emiddio Lenti (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015