Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Campori

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553¹Born
19 Sep 161663.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Oct 161663.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
17 Mar 162168.2AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
16 May 162168.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
4 Feb 164390.0DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Campori
Pietro Cardinal Campori (born 1553, died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnovo di Garfagnana

  • a bishop for 21.7 years
  • a cardinal for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1616
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 167
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 72, Number 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast