Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Desiderio Cardinal Scaglia, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Como

Cardinal-Priest of San Carlo al Corso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567BornCremona
11 Jan 162154.0Elevated to Cardinal
3 Mar 162154.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
17 Mar 162154.2AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
16 May 162154.4Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
14 Nov 162255.9AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
162659.0ResignedBishop of Como, Italy
9 Feb 162659.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
6 Oct 162760.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Carlo al Corso
21 Aug 163972.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Desiderio Scaglia:
Cardinal Desiderio Scaglia O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Como

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
  • a cardinal for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jan 1621
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 14, and Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 157
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 72, Number 419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013