Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erasmo Paravicini

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
14 Mar 161131.2AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
10 Apr 161131.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
16 Oct 161333.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gratz
20 Apr 162242.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Gratz
30 Sep 1640³60.7DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Erasmo Paravicini (VIAF: 316532673)
Bishop Erasmo Paravicini (born 1580, died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaete

  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 77
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 50, Number 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 10
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast